AZ SB1032 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Introduced in House and read first time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Border fence construction; appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Border fence construction; appropriation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-23HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2022-02-24HouseTransmit to House
2022-02-23SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0)
2022-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2022-02-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2022-02-21SenateSenate consent calendar
2022-02-21SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2022-02-15SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-1-0)
2022-01-11SenateSenate read second time
2022-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2022-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2022-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-12-17SenatePrefile

Subjects


Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback