AZ SB1032 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - Transmit to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - Transmit to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health care compact; funding
Title
Health care compact; funding
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-16 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-9-0-0) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2012-01-30 | Senate Consent Calendar January 30, 2012 @ 1:56 PM with Objections | |
2012-02-07 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-07 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-30 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-09 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Senate HMLR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-1-1-0) | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2012-01-10 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-09 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-09 | Assigned to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2012-01-09 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |