AZ SB1030 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Remote online notarization; registration

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Remote online notarization; registration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-12SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-12SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-11SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-04SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2019-01-15SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-14SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-14SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-01-09SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
447011Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback