AZ SB1030 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

AHCCCS; covered services; occupational therapy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AHCCCS; covered services; occupational therapy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-08 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Health Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2017-05-02HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-05-02HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-05-01HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-03-23HouseHouse HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-02-28HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-27HouseAssigned to House HEALTH Committee
2017-02-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-09HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-09SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (26-3-1-0)
2017-02-07SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-07SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-06SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-02-06SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-01-31SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-1-0)
2017-01-18SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2017-01-10SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-09SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-09SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2017-01-09SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2017-01-09SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-01-05SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
362907Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68458
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1030p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1030s.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68458&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68458&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68458&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68458&billStatusActionId=174500&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68458&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68458&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68458&billStatusActionId=177486&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback