AZ SB1030 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Dental hygienists; supervision
Title
Dental hygienists; supervision
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-13 | House third reading , voting: (40-16-4-0) | |
2011-04-07 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2011-03-28 | House Consent Calendar March 28, 2011 @ 3:07 PM with Objections | |
2011-03-29 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-3-0) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-16 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2011-03-07 | House read second time | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-02 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-01 | Senate third reading , voting: (20-9-1-0) | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-21 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-21 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Senate HMLR Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-1-1-0) | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2011-01-11 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-10 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-10 | Assigned to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |