AZ SB1028 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Adult cabaret performances; prohibited locations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adult cabaret performances; prohibited locations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-16 Governor Vetoed
2023-06-12 Transmitted to Governor
2023-05-15SenateTransmit to Senate
2023-05-15HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-1-0)
2023-04-10HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2023-04-04HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2023-04-04HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2023-04-04HouseHouse consent calendar
2023-04-04HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2023-03-29HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
2023-03-22HouseHouse read second time
2023-03-21HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2023-03-21HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2023-03-21HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2023-03-16HouseTransmit to House
2023-03-16SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0)
2023-03-15SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2023-03-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2023-03-14SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2023-03-13SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2023-02-02SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2023-01-11SenateSenate read second time
2023-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2023-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2023-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2023-01-06SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
131422.01New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/78081
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1028p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1r/bills/sb1028s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/proposed/S.1028KERN.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/56leg/1R/adopted/S.1028JUD.DOCX.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/502705
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/503430
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/506753
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/507517
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/507818
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/508362
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/509936
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/510142
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/510187
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/510188
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78081&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78081&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78081&billStatusActionId=217848&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78081&billStatusActionId=217851&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78081&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=78081&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78081&billStatusActionId=218414&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=78081&billStatusActionId=219074&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback