AZ SB1028 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Senate GOV Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Senate GOV Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ballot paper; security measures
Title
Ballot paper; security measures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Anti-fraud
Ballot Paper
Conduct Of Elections
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Repeal
Security Measures
Vendor Certification
Ballot Paper
Conduct Of Elections
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Repeal
Security Measures
Vendor Certification