AZ SB1027 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Informed consent; pelvic examinations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Informed consent; pelvic examinations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-21 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-03-03HouseHouse read second time
2020-03-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-03-02HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2020-03-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-02-04HouseTransmit to House
2020-02-04SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2020-02-03SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2020-01-28SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-01-28SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-01-27SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-01-22SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2020-01-14SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2020-01-13SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-12-10SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
323228New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72560
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1027p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1027s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/s.10270310.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1027hhs.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1027carter0828.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.1027butler.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72560&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72560&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72560&billStatusActionId=191992&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72560&billStatusActionId=192514&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72560&billStatusActionId=192718&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72560&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback