AZ SB1027 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-14 - Referred to House COM Committee
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-14 - Referred to House COM Committee
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Continuous alcohol monitoring program
Title
Continuous alcohol monitoring program
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-14 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2011-03-14 | House read second time | |
2011-03-10 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-10 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2011-03-10 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-08 | Senate third reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-21 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Senate JUD Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2011-01-11 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-10 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-10 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-01-10 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |