AZ SB1026 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Chapter 214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Chapter 214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School pupils; emergency medication administration
Title
School pupils; emergency medication administration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 214 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-1-1-0) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-04-30 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (41-18-1-0) |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-03-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2019-03-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-04 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (11-0-0-2-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Education - Title 15
Emergency Medication Administration
Prescription Medicines
School District Governing Board
School Pupils
Emergency Medication Administration
Prescription Medicines
School District Governing Board
School Pupils
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 344 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2229 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |