AZ SB1020 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Voting locations; electioneering

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting locations; electioneering

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2021-02-09SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-08SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-02-08SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-01SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0)
2021-01-12SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2021-01-11SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-12-18SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16411Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback