AZ SB1017 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Chapter 55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Informed consent; pelvic examinations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Informed consent; pelvic examinations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18SenateChapter 55
2021-03-18SenateGovernor Signed
2021-03-15SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-03-11SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-03-11HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2021-03-09HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-09HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-08HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-03-08HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2021-03-01HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-24HouseHouse read second time
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2021-02-23HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-01-28HouseTransmit to House
2021-01-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2021-01-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-01-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-01-25SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-01-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-01-13SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2021-01-12SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2021-01-11SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-12-16SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
323228New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74286
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1017p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1017s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0055.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/480035
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485992
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486227
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488406
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488435
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74286&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74286&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74286&billStatusActionId=198829&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74286&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74286&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74286&billStatusActionId=203073&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback