AZ SB1014 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation HB2184

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Chapter 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

English language learners; instruction; budgeting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

English language learners; instruction; budgeting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateChapter 3
2019-02-14SenateGovernor Signed
2019-02-12SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-02-11SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-02-11HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-02-05HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-05SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-02-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-01-29SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-01-29SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-01-28SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-01-15SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-15SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2019-01-14SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-14SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-01-02SenatePrefile

Same As/Similar To

HB2184 (Replaces) 2019-02-07 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15756.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15756.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15756.03Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15756.04Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15756.06Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
15756.07Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15756.08Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15756.10Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15756.12Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411279.03Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71033
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1014p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1014s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0003.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.1014boyer.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1014ed.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1014boyer1104.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71033&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71033&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71033&billStatusActionId=185431&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71033&billStatusActionId=185819&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71033&billStatusActionId=186131&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback