AZ SB1013 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Missing children; DCS; required reporting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Missing children; DCS; required reporting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseHouse read second time
2020-03-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-03-09HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2020-03-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-03-02HouseTransmit to House
2020-03-02SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2020-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2020-02-18SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-18SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-17SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-02-13SenateSenate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2020-01-14SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2020-01-13SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-11-15SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8467New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72492
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1013p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1013s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/s.1013farnsworth e.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1013jud.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1013farnsworth d0758.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72492&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72492&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72492&billStatusActionId=194256&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72492&billStatusActionId=194500&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72492&billStatusActionId=194948&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback