AZ SB1013 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Senate TPS Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Technical correction; insurance; existing actions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Technical correction; insurance; existing actions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20SenateSenate TPS Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate TPS Committee
2019-01-15SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-14SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-14SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-12-27SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20112Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback