AZ SB1009 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Insurance; corporations; directors

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; corporations; directors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-03-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-05HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-27HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-01-30HouseTransmit to House
2018-01-30SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0)
2018-01-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-01-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-10SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0)
2018-01-09SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-08SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-08SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2018-01-08SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-11-28SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20829Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69628
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1009p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1009s.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.10090839.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1009fin.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69628&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69628&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69628&billStatusActionId=179736&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69628&billStatusActionId=179937&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69628&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69628&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69628&billStatusActionId=182626&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback