AZ SB1008 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Chapter 157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Common schools; average daily membership

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Common schools; average daily membership

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10SenateChapter 157
2018-04-10SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-04SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-03SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-4-0)
2018-03-27HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-27HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-26HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-26HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-03-07HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-26HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-15HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-15SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2018-02-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-02-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0)
2018-01-18SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-09SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-08SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-08SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2018-01-08SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2018-01-08SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-11-16SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15901Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69614
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1008p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1008s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0157.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69614&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69614&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69614&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69614&billStatusActionId=180882&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69614&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69614&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69614&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#5
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69614&billStatusActionId=182892&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback