AZ SB1007 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chapter 428
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Parental rights; petition; sexual assault

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parental rights; petition; sexual assault

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Criminal Justice Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-09SenateChapter 428
2021-07-09SenateGovernor Signed
2021-06-30SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-06-28SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-06-28HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2021-04-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-04-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-04-19HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-04-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-24HouseHouse CJR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-18HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-10HouseHouse read second time
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to House CJR Committee
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2021-03-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-03-04HouseTransmit to House
2021-03-03SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2021-03-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-22SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-18SenateSenate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2021-01-12SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2021-01-11SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-12-15SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8533Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8545New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74268
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1007p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1007s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0428.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.1007petersen.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1007jud.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484536
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486106
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487713
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488116
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/490347
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74268&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74268&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74268&billStatusActionId=201966&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74268&billStatusActionId=202607&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74268&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74268&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74268&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74268&billStatusActionId=204526&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback