AZ SB1005 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Chapter 32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Private fund advisers; exemption

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private fund advisers; exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Banking and Financial Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate Financial Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-17 Chapter 32
2016-03-17 Governor Signed
2016-03-17 Transmitted to Governor
2016-03-16HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-03-16HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-1-0-0)
2016-03-08HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-08HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-07HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2016-02-17HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-03-01HouseHouse BFS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0)
2016-02-18HouseReferred to House BFS Committee
2016-02-18HouseHouse read second time
2016-02-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-02-17HouseAssigned to House BFS Committee
2016-02-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2016-02-11SenateTransmit to House
2016-02-11SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2016-02-10SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-02-09SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-08SenateSenate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment
2016-01-11SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-03SenateSenate FI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2016-01-12SenateReferred to Senate FI Committee
2016-01-12SenateSenate read second time
2016-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate FI Committee
2016-01-11SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback