AZ SB1005 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Dispensing opticians board; continuation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dispensing opticians board; continuation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-11 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-13 Governor Signed
2012-03-08 Transmitted to Governor
2012-03-08 Transmit to Senate
2012-03-08 House third reading PASSED voting: (49-7-4-0)
2012-03-05 House Consent Calendar March 05, 2012 @ 1:39 PM
2012-03-06 House majority caucus: Do pass
2012-03-06 House minority caucus: Do pass
2012-03-05 House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0)
2012-02-13 Referred to House RULES Committee
2012-02-22 House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0)
2012-02-14 Referred to House HHS Committee
2012-02-14 House read second time
2012-02-13 Assigned to House RULES Committee
2012-02-13 Assigned to House HHS Committee
2012-02-13 Introduced in House and read first time
2012-01-19 Transmit to House
2012-01-19 Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-5-1-0)
2012-01-17 Senate Consent Calendar January 17, 2012 @ 2:02 PM
2012-01-17 Senate majority caucus: Do pass
2012-01-17 Senate minority caucus: Do pass
2012-01-17 Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2012-01-09 Referred to Senate RULES Committee
2012-01-11 Senate HMLR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-0-0)
2012-01-10 Referred to Senate HMLR Committee
2012-01-10 Senate read second time
2012-01-09 Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
2012-01-09 Assigned to Senate HMLR Committee
2012-01-09 Introduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback