AZ SB1003 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Banking permits; fees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Banking permits; fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House BI Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House BI Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-01-29HouseTransmit to House
2018-01-29SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-01-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-22SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-01-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-10SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-09SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-08SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-08SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2018-01-08SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-11-15SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6126Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback