AZ SB1002 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Senate COM Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

State lottery; keno game

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State lottery; keno game

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21SenateSenate COM Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-01-15SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-14SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-14SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-14SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-12-18SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5551Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5554Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5571Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5572Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback