AZ SB1002 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-29 - Senate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-29 - Senate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Home-based businesses; regulations; municipalities
Title
Home-based businesses; regulations; municipalities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COMPS Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Accessory Structure
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Home-based Business
Municipal Zoning
Municipalities
Regulation
Restriction On Regulation
Temporary Commercial Sign
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Home-based Business
Municipal Zoning
Municipalities
Regulation
Restriction On Regulation
Temporary Commercial Sign