AZ SB1001 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Special

Note: Replaces legislation HB2001

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Controlled substances; regulation; appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances; regulation; appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-26SenateGovernor Signed
2018-01-26SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-01-25HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2018-01-25HouseTransmit to House
2018-01-25SenateSenate third reading None voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-01-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-01-25SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-25SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-24SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-23SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-22SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-22SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2018-01-22SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Same As/Similar To

HB2001 (Replaces) 2018-01-25 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11269.18Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11269.20New CodeSee Bill Text
11269.21New CodeSee Bill Text
132310Amended CodeSee Bill Text
133423Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
151756New CodeSee Bill Text
321201.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321298Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321451.04Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321491Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321606Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321743Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321854Amended CodeSee Bill Text
321871Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322239.01New CodeSee Bill Text
322281Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322532Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322933Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322951Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32854.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32871Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36109New CodeSee Bill Text
36123New CodeSee Bill Text
36192New CodeSee Bill Text
362228Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362267Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362525Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362606Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362930.06New CodeSee Bill Text
36407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36425.04New CodeSee Bill Text
9500.40Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9500.41New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70415
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1s/bills/sb1001p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1s/bills/sb1001s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1s/adopted/s.1001flooryarbrough.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1s/adopted/s.1001flooryarbrough3.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1s/adopted/s.1001flooryarbrough2.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70415&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70415&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70415&billStatusActionId=179606&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70415&billStatusActionId=179607&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70415&billStatusActionId=179609&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback