AZ HR2001 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-18 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Ash Fork; flagstone capital

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ash Fork; flagstone capital

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-18 Transmitted to Secretary Of State
2014-02-18HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2014-02-11HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-11HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-10HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0)
2014-01-28HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2014-02-05HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0)
2014-01-29HouseReferred to House COM Committee
2014-01-29HouseHouse read second time
2014-01-28HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2014-01-28HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2014-01-28HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback