AZ HCR2047 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SCR1039
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Lindsey Perry; auditor general.
Title
Lindsey Perry; auditor general.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2018-05-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-05-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-04-25 | House | House read second time |
2018-04-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-4-0-0) |
2018-04-25 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-04-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SCR1039 (Replaced by) 2018-05-04 - Transmitted to Secretary of State