AZ HCR2043 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Initiative, referendum; vote percentage requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Initiative, referendum; vote percentage requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-04SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2016-03-07SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-03-15SenateSenate FMFR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2016-03-08SenateReferred to Senate FMFR Committee
2016-03-08SenateSenate read second time
2016-03-07SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-03-07SenateAssigned to Senate FMFR Committee
2016-03-07SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2016-03-03HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-03-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (32-25-3-0)
2016-02-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2016-02-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-22HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0)
2016-02-08HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-02-15HouseHouse ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-0-0)
2016-02-09HouseReferred to House ELECT Committee
2016-02-09HouseHouse read second time
2016-02-08HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-02-08HouseAssigned to House ELECT Committee
2016-02-08HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback