AZ HCR2038 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Legislation replaced by SCR1018

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-07 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Trust land management; budget reconciliation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trust land management; budget reconciliation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2015-03-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-06HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-1-0)
2015-03-04HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2015-03-06HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-5-0-1-0)
2015-03-05HouseReferred to House APPROP Committee
2015-03-05HouseHouse read second time
2015-03-04HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2015-03-04HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2015-03-04HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SCR1018 (Replaced by) 2015-03-09 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback