AZ HCR2038 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Failed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Senate ED Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Failed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Senate ED Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Line item veto; limitation
Title
Line item veto; limitation
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Sen. Andy Biggs [R] | Rep. Tom Boone [R] | Rep. Tom Chabin [D] |
Rep. Steve Court [R] | Sen. Adam Driggs [R] | Rep. Doris Goodale [R] | Sen. Ron Gould [R] |
Rep. Jack Harper [R] | Rep. Laurin Hendrix [R] | Rep. Russell Jones [R] | Sen. John Kavanagh [R] |
Rep. Nancy McLain [R] | Sen. Rick Murphy [R] | Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] | Rep. Carl Seel [R] |
Rep. Andy Tobin [R] | Sen. Steven Yarbrough [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Senate ED Committee action: Held | |
2010-04-07 | Referred to Senate ED Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-04-01 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2010-04-01 | Senate read second time | |
2010-04-01 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | |
2010-04-01 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-30 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-30 | House third reading , voting: (34-24-2-0) | |
2010-03-25 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-03-08 | House Consent Calendar March 08, 2010 @ 3:00 PM with Objections | |
2010-03-08 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-08 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-08 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-24 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-4-0-2-0) | |
2010-02-16 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2010-02-16 | House read second time | |
2010-02-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-15 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2010-02-15 | Introduced in House and read first time |