AZ HCR2035 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Government Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Washington, D.C.; statehood; opposition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Washington, D.C.; statehood; opposition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-08SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-04SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-04SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-03-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0)
2021-03-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2021-02-18HouseHouse GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-12SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-09HouseHouse read second time
2021-02-08HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-02-08HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-02-08HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75986
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hcr2035p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hcr2035h.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484325
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485090
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486756
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75986&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75986&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75986&billStatusActionId=202516&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75986&billStatusActionId=202524&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback