AZ HCR2029 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - House third reading FAILED voting: (15-42-3-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - House third reading FAILED voting: (15-42-3-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Article V; natural born citizen
Title
Article V; natural born citizen
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Townsend [R] | Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] | Rep. Brenda Barton [R] | Rep. Noel Campbell [R] |
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] | Rep. Mark Finchem [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (15-42-3-0) |
2016-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-19 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | House FSR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-1-0) |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred to House FSR Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to House FSR Committee |
2016-01-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |