AZ HCR2024 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
30x30 land program; opposing
Title
30x30 land program; opposing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-15-2-0) |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0) |
2022-02-01 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-01 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-31 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-01-31 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-24 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-5-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |