AZ HCR2022 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-02 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-02 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Auditor general; reappointment.
Title
Auditor general; reappointment.
Sponsors
Rep. John Allen [R] | Sen. Paul Boyer [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] |
Sen. Kelly Townsend [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-20 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2015-02-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-3-0) |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2015-02-02 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |