AZ HCR2020 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Government Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Lieutenant governor; joint candidacy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lieutenant governor; joint candidacy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-08SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-08SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2021-03-08SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-03-04SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-03-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (45-14-1-0)
2021-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-02-22HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-17HouseHouse GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-5-0-1-0-0)
2021-02-03HouseHouse read second time
2021-02-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-02-02HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-02-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75033
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hcr2020p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hcr2020h.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484324
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484825
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485549
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75033&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75033&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75033&billStatusActionId=201337&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75033&billStatusActionId=202782&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback