AZ HCR2017 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional property tax exemptions; consolidation
Title
Constitutional property tax exemptions; consolidation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (51-7-2-0) |
2022-02-15 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-14 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-14 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-02-09 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-2-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Concurrent Resolution
Consolidation
Constitution Of Arizona
Constitutional Amendments (arizona)
Constitutional Property Tax Exemptions
Property Tax Exemptions
Consolidation
Constitution Of Arizona
Constitutional Amendments (arizona)
Constitutional Property Tax Exemptions
Property Tax Exemptions
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 806.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 829 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |