AZ HCR2013 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Consumer data; privacy; federal standard
Title
Consumer data; privacy; federal standard
Sponsors
Sen. Shawnna Bolick [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Sen. Frank Carroll [R] | Rep. Mark Finchem [R] |
Rep. Aaron Lieberman [D] | Rep. Joanne Osborne [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-19 | House | House TECH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Assigned to House TECH Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-01-10 | House | Prefile |