AZ HCR2009 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Obscenity; sex trafficking; minors; protection
Title
Obscenity; sex trafficking; minors; protection
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] | Rep. Brenda Barton [R] | Rep. Noel Campbell [R] | Rep. Todd Clodfelter [R] |
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] | Rep. Mark Finchem [R] | Rep. Drew John [R] | Rep. Jay Lawrence [R] |
Rep. Paul Mosley [R] | Rep. Becky Nutt [R] | Rep. Kevin Payne [R] | Rep. David Stringer [R] |
Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (50-6-4-0) |
2018-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2018-02-13 | House | House FPRPP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-2-0-0) |
2018-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned to House FPRPP Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |