AZ HCR2006 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Four-year terms; legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Four-year terms; legislature.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-27SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-27SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-26SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-22SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2018-03-07SenateSenate read second time
2018-03-06SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-03-06SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2018-03-06SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-03-05SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-03-05HouseHouse third reading None voting: (33-22-5-0)
2018-03-05HouseHouse additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-20HouseHouse motion to reconsider third reading
2018-02-20HouseHouse third reading FAILED voting: (25-34-1-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-01HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-1-0-0)
2018-01-22HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2018-01-18HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69872
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hcr2006p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hcr2006h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hcr2006s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.hcr2006salman.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.hcr2006floorgriffin.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69872&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69872&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69872&billStatusActionId=181271&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69872&billStatusActionId=181335&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69872&billStatusActionId=181341&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69872&billStatusActionId=182268&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69872&billStatusActionId=182276&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69872&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69872&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69872&billStatusActionId=183363&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback