AZ HCM2007 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Blue water navy; Vietnam veterans

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Blue water navy; Vietnam veterans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02 Transmitted to Secretary of State
2018-03-29HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-29SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-03-27SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-27SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-26SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-21SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-03-15SenateSenate read second time
2018-03-14SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-03-14SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-12HouseHouse MVRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-02-08HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-07HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-07HouseAssigned to House MVRA Committee
2018-02-07HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70752
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hcm2007p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hcm2007h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/hcm2007.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70752&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70752&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70752&billStatusActionId=181529&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70752&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70752&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70752&billStatusActionId=182737&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70752&billStatusActionId=182806&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback