AZ HCM2006 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; traditional American holidays; recognition
Title
Schools; traditional American holidays; recognition
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Dial [R] | Sen. Sally Gonzales [D] | Rep. Jack Harper [R] | Rep. Peggy Judd [R] |
Sen. Javan Mesnard [R] | Sen. Catherine Miranda [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Transmitted to Secretary Of State | |
2012-04-18 | Transmit to House | |
2012-04-18 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) | |
2012-03-12 | Senate Consent Calendar March 12, 2012 @ 1:20 PM | |
2012-03-13 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-13 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-12 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-02-27 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Senate GR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-28 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-02-28 | Senate read second time | |
2012-02-27 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-02-24 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-02-23 | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-5-2-0) | |
2012-02-22 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-16 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-15 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-13 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-23 | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-1-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House ED Committee | |
2012-01-18 | House read second time | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House ED Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced in House and read first time |