AZ HCM2003 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Deported veterans; medical treatment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deported veterans; medical treatment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14SenateSenate read second time
2018-03-13SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-03-13SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-03-13SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2018-03-13SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2018-03-13SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-03-12SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-03-12HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (49-8-3-0)
2018-03-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-05HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-01-29HouseHouse MVRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-23HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-22HouseAssigned to House MVRA Committee
2018-01-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback