AZ HCM2001 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

NAFTA; renegotiation; support

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NAFTA; renegotiation; support

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - Motion (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - Motion Representative Chávez moved that HCM 2001 be referred to additional COW for purpose of amending (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2018-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-12SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-12HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (46-12-1-0)
2018-02-12HouseHouse additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-08HouseHouse miscellaneous motion: Representative Chávez moved that HCM 2001 be referred to additional COW for purpose of amending
2018-02-08HouseHouse refer to additional Committee of the Whole
2018-02-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-05HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-24HouseHouse LIA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-23HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-22HouseAssigned to House LIA Committee
2018-01-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69922
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hcm2001p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hcm2001h.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69922&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69922&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69922&billStatusActionId=180598&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69922&billStatusActionId=180606&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69922&billStatusActionId=180622&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69922&billStatusActionId=182264&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback