AZ HB2905 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1837
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chapter 426
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chapter 426
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Early ballots; request required
Title
Early ballots; request required
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Motion Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing House Bill 2905 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - Motion Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2905 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Motion Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing House Bill 2905 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - Motion Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2905 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Senate | Chapter 426 |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing House Bill 2905 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-06-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-26-3-0) |
2021-06-25 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2905 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading |
2021-06-15 | House | House read second time |
2021-06-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1837 (Replaces) 2021-06-30 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Subjects
Class 5 Felony
County Recorder
Early Ballots
Early Voting
Election Officers
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Permanent Early Voting Lists
Request
Required
County Recorder
Early Ballots
Early Voting
Election Officers
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Permanent Early Voting Lists
Request
Required