AZ HB2879 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Chapter 342
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Chapter 342
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DOR; procedures; administrative rulings
Title
DOR; procedures; administrative rulings
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Toma [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Chapter 342 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-03 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (44-16-0-0) |
2021-05-03 | House | House concurs |
2021-04-29 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2021-04-29 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-2-4-0) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-2-1-0) |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-17 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-11 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Conformity
Exceptions
Gross Income
Internal Revenue Code
Retroactivity
Taxation - Title 42
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Exceptions
Gross Income
Internal Revenue Code
Retroactivity
Taxation - Title 42
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 1001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1022.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |