AZ HB2860 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1727
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Chapter 311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Chapter 311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal justice; 2022-2023
Title
Criminal justice; 2022-2023
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Motion HB 2860 substituted for SB 1727. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Motion HB 2860 substituted for SB 1721. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Motion HB 2860 substituted for SB 1721. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Senate | Chapter 311 |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-9-2-0) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2860 substituted for SB 1727. Motion carried. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-06-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-11-1-0) |
2022-06-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-06-21 | House | House read second time |
2022-06-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2022-06-21 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0) |
2022-06-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-06-20 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2022-06-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1727 (Replaces) 2022-06-23 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Subjects
2022-2023
Criminal Justice
Effective Date
Military Affairs And Emergency Management - Title 26
State Government - Title 41
Criminal Justice
Effective Date
Military Affairs And Emergency Management - Title 26
State Government - Title 41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1612 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1712 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1730 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 2401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 2409 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 2410 | New Code | See Bill Text |