AZ HB2850 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-21 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-21 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
2022-2023 budget; K-12 education
Title
2022-2023 budget; K-12 education
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-21 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2022-06-21 | House | House Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0) |
2022-04-20 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (6-7-0-0-0-0) |
2022-04-19 | House | House read second time |
2022-04-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-04-18 | House | Assigned to House Committee |
2022-04-18 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2022-04-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
2022-2023
Appropriations
Budget
Education - Title 15
K-12 Education
Legislative Intent
State Government - Title 41
Appropriations
Budget
Education - Title 15
K-12 Education
Legislative Intent
State Government - Title 41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 945 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1276 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |