AZ HB2846 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Public officials; entities; civil liability
Title
Public officials; entities; civil liability
Sponsors
Rep. Amish Shah [D] | Rep. Russell Bowers [R] | Rep. Mark Finchem [R] | Rep. Randall Friese [D] |
Rep. Jeff Weninger [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-20 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |