AZ HB2843 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Sober living homes; fees; penalties
Title
Sober living homes; fees; penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-20 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 2062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |