AZ HB2840 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Misconduct involving weapons; school grounds
Title
Misconduct involving weapons; school grounds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-1-0) |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-17 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-1-0-0) |
2021-02-11 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |