AZ HB2837 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Government Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Government Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
District committees; reapportionment; reorganization
Title
District committees; reapportionment; reorganization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-26-3-0) |
2022-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-16 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-5-1-0-0-0) |
2022-02-10 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |